MS HB1618 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The Town Of Seminary, Mississippi, To Establish A Cemetery Fund For Certain Purposes; To Provide That The Board Of Aldermen Of The Town May Appoint A Cemetery Advisory Committee; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Town of Seminary; authorize to establish a town cemetery fund and cemetery advisory committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2018-03-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Passed |
2018-03-13 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-02-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |