MS HB1616 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making A Reappropriation To The Department Of Finance And Administration To Reauthorize The Expenditure Of Special Funds Previously Appropriated For Construction And/or Repair And Renovation Projects At Various State Agencies And Institutions, For Fiscal Year 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; reappropriation, DFA - Bureau of Building; FY19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11 Approved by Governor
2018-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-03-25SenateConference Report Adopted
2018-03-25HouseConference Report Adopted
2018-03-24SenateConference Report Filed
2018-03-24HouseConference Report Filed
2018-03-21SenateConferees Named Clarke,Burton,Dearing
2018-03-19HouseConferees Named Read,Denny,Boyd
2018-03-15HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2018-03-14SenateReturned For Concurrence
2018-03-13SenatePassed As Amended
2018-03-13SenateAmended
2018-03-07SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2018-02-15SenateReferred To Appropriations
2018-02-14HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-02-13HousePassed
2018-02-13HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-02-12HouseReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback