MS HB1615 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds To Pay Costs Associated With Construction, Repair And Renovation Of And Upgrades And Improvements To Buildings, Facilities And Infrastructure At Buccaneer State Park In Hancock County, Mississippi; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds To Assist In Paying Costs Associated With Dredging At Port Bienville In Hancock County; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; authorize issuance for improvements at Buccaneer State Park and dredging at Port Bienville in Hancock County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed |
2019-02-26 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |