MS HB1614 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Approving The Expenditure Of Special Funds For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Tombigbee River Valley Water Management District For The Fiscal Year 2019.
Title
Appropriation; Tombigbee River Valley Water Management District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | House | Referred To Appropriations |