MS HB1613 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds In The Amount Of $1,000,000.00 For The Ace Fund; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds In The Amount Of $1,000,000.00 For The Mississippi Development Authority Workforce Training Fund; To Amend Section 57-61-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase By $2,000,000.00 The Amount Of General Obligation Bonds That May Be Issued Under The Mississippi Business Investment Act; To Amend Section 57-61-36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Amount Of Bond Proceeds That The Mississippi Development Authority May Utilize Under The Mississippi Business Investment Act To Make Grants To Counties And Municipalities Through A Development Infrastructure Grant Fund To Complete Infrastructure Related To New Or Expanded Industry; To Increase The Amount Of Bond Proceeds That The Mississippi Development Authority May Utilize Under The Mississippi Business Investment Act To Make Grants Or Loans To Counties And Municipalities Through An Equipment And Public Facilities Grant And Loan Fund To Aid In Infrastructure-related Improvements, The Purchase Of Equipment And In The Purchase, Construction Or Repair And Renovation Of Facilities; To Amend Section 57-75-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By House Bill No. 1, 2016 First Extraordinary Session, To Increase From $63,000,000.00 To $64,000,000.00 The Amount Of General Obligation Bonds That May Be Issued Under The Mississippi Major Economic Impact Act For Projects Designed To Enhance Facilities That Are At Risk For Closure Pursuant To The Base Closure And Realignment Act Of 1991 Or Other Applicable Federal Law; To Amend Section 65-4-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase By $1,000,000.00 The Amount Of Bonds That May Be Issued Under The Economic Development Highway Act; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds To The Pascagoula Redevelopment Authority For Use By The Authority In Its Commercial Development Incentive Program To Incentivize Private Investment Into Mixed Use And Commercial Projects Along The Waterfront Of The Pascagoula River; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds To Assist The Oakland-yalobusha Natural Gas District In Paying Costs Associated With Improvements To District Infrastructure, Equipment And Facilities; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; authorize issuance of general obligation bonds for various Mississippi Development Authority programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2016-03-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-03-15 | House | Passed |
2016-03-15 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-03-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |