MS HB1612 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize Municipalities To Create Special Local Improvement Assessment Districts; To Provide The Notice And Election Procedures For The Establishment Of Such Districts; To Authorize The Levy Of An Assessment Of Up To Six Mills On Taxable Real Property Located Within Such Assessment Districts; To Provide For The Duties And Powers Of Such Assessment Districts; To Require The Dissolution Of Such Assessment Districts Under Certain Circumstances; To Specify The Use For The Proceeds Of The Special Assessment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special local improvement assessment districts; authorize municipalities to create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 89 N: 17 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Failed (Y: 57 N: 55 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29 Approved by Governor
2019-03-25SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-25HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2019-03-20SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-19SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-19SenateAmended
2019-03-18SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-03-05SenateReferred To Finance
2019-03-04HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-28HousePassed
2019-02-28HouseReconsidered
2019-02-26HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Smith, Lamar)
2019-02-26HouseFailed
2019-02-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-13HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback