MS HB1608 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Forrest County, Mississippi, To Maintain In Electronic Format Rather Than Paper Format Law Books That Are Placed In The County Courthouse And The Public County Law Library; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Forrest County; authorize to maintain electronic format of law books in county courtroom and public county law library.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Byrd [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2020-06-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed |
2020-06-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |