MS HB1600 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Support And Maintenance Of The State Forestry Commission And For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi Institute For Forest Inventory For The Fiscal Year 2013.
Title
Appropriation; Forestry Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Donnie Bell [R] | Rep. Scott Bounds [R] | Rep. Becky Currie [R] | Rep. Blaine Eaton [D] |
Rep. Karl Gibbs [D] | Rep. Mac Huddleston [R] | Rep. Nolan Mettetal [R] | Rep. Bobby Shows [R] |
Rep. Preston Sullivan [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-29 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-29 | Reconsidered | |
2012-04-28 | Recommitted For Further Conf | |
2012-04-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-27 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-27 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-25 | Conferees Named Clarke,Collins,Lee | |
2012-04-24 | Conferees Named Frierson,Sullivan,Eaton | |
2012-04-18 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2012-04-17 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-17 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-13 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-13 | Amended | |
2012-04-12 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-26 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2012-03-23 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-22 | Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-21 | Referred To Appropriations |