MS HB160 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Be Known As The "travel Insurance Act Of 2022" Which Revises The "limited Lines Travel Insurance Act"; To Amend Section 83-83-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Name Of The Act; To Create New Section 83-83-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide The Scope And Purposes Of The Act; To Amend Section 83-83-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define Certain Terms; To Amend Section 83-83-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Update The Requirements Of Limited Lines Travel Insurance Producers Under The Act; To Create New Section 83-83-6, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Premium Tax Requirements Of Travel Insurers Under The Act; To Create New Section 83-83-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Set Forth How Travel Protection Plans May Be Sold In This State; To Amend Section 83-83-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Update The Policies Under The Act; To Create New Section 83-83-10, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide The Requirements For Travel Administrators Under The Act; To Amend Section 83-83-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Permissible Sales Practices Under The Act; To Create New Section 83-83-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Commissioner Of Insurance To Promulgate Regulations To Implement Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Travel Insurance Act of 2022; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Zuber [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed |
2022-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-04 | House | Referred To Insurance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
83 | 83 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 83 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 83 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 83 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 83 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |