MS HB160 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 91-7-259, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Person Or Financial Institution May Turn Over Personal Property Or Funds Of A Decedent In Its Possession To An Executor Or Administrator Who Has Qualified In Another State And May Rely Upon A Certified Copy Of The Record Of The Appointment And Qualification Of The Executor Or Administrator According To The Law Of The State Where He Is Qualified; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Foreign executor or administrator; revise authority of financial institutions to turn over property or funds of a decedent to.
Sponsors
Rep. Philip Gunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2015-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-04 | House | Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |