MS HB160 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-19-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Procedure To Expunge Certain Felony Convictions; To Amend Section 41-29-150, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Crimes; revise expunction of certain convictions.
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby Moak [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 63 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 17 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-01-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 17 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-01-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-24 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-24 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-18 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2010-03-15 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-11 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-11 | Amended | |
2010-03-11 | Reconsidered | |
2010-03-10 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-10 | Failed | |
2010-03-10 | Amendment Failed | |
2010-03-08 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2010-03-08 | Amendment Failed | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-01-29 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B | |
2010-01-28 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-01-28 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-01-21 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-01-21 | Passed | |
2010-01-21 | Amendment Failed | |
2010-01-14 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-05 | Referred To Judiciary B |