MS HB1597 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The Town Of Byhalia, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Sales Of Hotels And Motels Derived From Room Rentals; To Provide That The Revenue From The Tax Shall Be Expended By The Town Of Byhalia To Enhance Tourism And Parks And Recreation; To Provide That The Tax Shall Be Collected By The State Tax Commission And Paid To The Town Of Byhalia; To Provide For An Election On Whether The Tax May Be Levied; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Town of Byhalia; authorize a tax on hotels and motels.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-23 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-21 Approved by Governor
2010-05-04 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-04-29 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-04-23 Concurred in Amend From Senate
2010-04-23 Returned For Concurrence
2010-04-23 Immediate Release
2010-04-23 Passed As Amended
2010-04-23 Amended
2010-04-23 Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
2010-04-23 DR - TSDPAA: FI To LP
2010-04-22 DR - TSDPAA: LP To FI
2010-04-22 Referred To Local and Private;Finance
2010-04-22 Transmitted To Senate
2010-04-22 Immediate Release
2010-04-22 Passed
2010-04-22 Title Suff Do Pass
2010-04-22 DR - TSDP: WM To LP
2010-04-21 DR - TSDP: LP To WM
2010-02-03 Referred To Local and Private Legislation;Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback