MS HB1585 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 51-35-333, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That If The Board Of Directors Of A District Formed Under The Urban Flood And Drainage Control Act Determines That A Flood Or Drainage Control Project Will Benefit Only A Portion Of The District, The Board May Levy Special Assessments On The Property So Benefited To Pay Certain Costs Related To Such Project; To Provide For The Collection Of Such Assessments; To Provide That Prior To Levying Such A Special Assessment, The Board Of Directors Of The District Shall Make A Determination That The Necessary Approvals And Authorizations Are In Place And That Project-related Activities Are Ready To Commence; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urban Flood Control and Drainage Law; authorize special assessment on property benefited by projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22 Approved by Governor
2017-03-15SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-15SenateReturned For Enrolling
2017-03-14SenatePassed
2017-03-13SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2017-03-06SenateReferred To Finance
2017-02-22HouseTransmitted To Senate
2017-02-21HousePassed
2017-02-20HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2017-02-15HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback