MS HB158 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "sexual Assault Response For College Students Act"; To Provide Certain Definitions For The Act; To Require All Higher Education Institutions To Adopt A Comprehensive Policy That Is Consistent With Federal And State Law Regarding The Institution's Response To Allegations Of Sexual Assault, Domestic Violence, Dating Violence, Sexual Exploitation And Stalking; To List The Minimum Requirements To Be Included In Such Policy; To Require Each Higher Education Institution To Prominently Publish, Timely Update, And Have Easily Accessible On Its Official School Website Such Policy; To Require Each Higher Education Institution To Have Access To An On-campus Confidential Advisor To Provide Counseling, Mental Health Support And Physical Health Support To Complainants, Respondents, And Survivors; To Require The Higher Education Institution To Train All Employees, Student Employees And Persons With Supervising Authority Regarding Standards To Assist Any Student Who Alleges A Violation Of The Comprehensive Policy Described By This Act; To Require All Higher Education Institutions To Adopt Procedures To Resolve Complaints Of Alleged Violations Of Such Policy; And For Related Purposes.
Title
The Sexual Assault Response For College Students Act; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Judiciary, Division B |
2020-03-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |