MS HB1576 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation From Special Funds In The State Treasury For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi Real Estate Commission And Mississippi Real Estate Appraiser Licensing And Certification Board For Fiscal Year 2019.
Title
Appropriation: Real Estate Commission and Appraiser Licensing and Certification Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | House | Referred To Appropriations |