MS HB1571 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-101-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Manner By Which The Executive Offices Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning Are Elected; To Remove The Sole Authority From The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning To A Seven Member Search Committee Comprised Of Appointed Alumni Of The Institution In Which A Vacancy In The Executive Office Exist; To Provide For The Composition Of The Search Committees And Prescribe Its Responsibilities; And For Related Purposes.
Title
IHL Board; revise authority to choose institution executive heads.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] | Rep. Randy Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges |
2020-03-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-03-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Holloway, Huddleston, Scoggin) |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges |