MS HB1568 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 9-11-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Number Of Justice Court Judges That Are Required For Counties Of 35,000 Or Less; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Justice court judges; revise the number for counties of 35,000 or less.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2013-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |