MS HB1564 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds To Assist The City Of Louisville, Mississippi, In Paying Costs Associated With Constructing A Road And Other Transportation Infrastructure In The City That Will Provide And Improve Access To Land Owned By The City Designated For An Economic Development Project; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds To Assist The City Of Baldwyn, Mississippi, In Paying Costs Associated With Making Improvements And Upgrades To A Portion Of The City's Natural Gas System Transmission System Line And Related Infrastructure; To Amend Section 28, Chapter 511, Laws Of 2016, To Revise The Purposes For Which The Proceeds Of Bonds Authorized To Be Issued For The City Of Saltillo, Mississippi, May Be Used; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; authorize issuance to assist City of Louisville with constructing an access road for economic development project.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Smith [R] | Rep. Joey Hood [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2018-02-23 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-21 | House | Amended |
2018-02-21 | House | Reconsidered |
2018-02-14 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Turner, Smith, Lamar) |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |