MS HB1559 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Office Of The Attorney General To Establish A Program To Provide Counseling, Medical Needs, Transitional Housing And Other Related Services To Victims Of Human Trafficking And Commercial Sexual Exploitation Through Shelters And Victim Service Providers Established To Serve Such Victims At No Charge To The Victim; To Create The "victims Of Human Trafficking And Commercial Sexual Exploitation Fund" As A Special Fund; To Provide That Monies In The Fund Shall Be Used To Fund And Assist Human Trafficking And Commercial Sexual Exploitation Shelters And Victim Services Providers; To Provide The Requirements That Shelters Must Meet To Qualify For Funds Under The Program; To Amend Section 99-19-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create Certain Assessments To Provide Monies To Be Deposited Into The Fund; To Amend Section 43-26-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Commissioner Of Child Protection Services To Hire A Coordinator Of Services For Victims Of Human Trafficking And Commercial Sexual Exploitation Within The Department Of Child Protection Services; To Require The Commissioner Of Child Protection Services To Develop Standards For The Investigation, Custody And Care For Victims Of Human Trafficking And Commercial Sexual Exploitation; To Provide The Duties For The Coordinator Of Services For Victims Of Human Trafficking And Commercial Sexual Exploitation; To Create New Section 43-26-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Department Of Child Protection Services To Follow Certain Procedures When Responding To Allegations Of Child Abuse, Human Trafficking And Commercial Sexual Exploitation; To Require Certain Persons To Be Placed On An Emergency, Separate And Specialized Assessment Team Created By The Coordinator Of Services For Victims Of Human Trafficking And Commercial Sexual Exploitation; To Amend Section 43-15-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Sections; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human trafficking and commercial sexual exploitation; provide services for victims through approved services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 89 N: 19 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-09 Law W/out Governor's Signature
2020-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-30SenateImmediate Release
2020-06-30SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-30HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-29HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-29SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-26SenateConferees Named Doty,Boyd,Kirby
2020-06-26HouseConferees Named Bain,Yates,White
2020-06-24HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-19SenateReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-19SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2020-06-17SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2020-06-16SenatePassed As Amended
2020-06-16SenateAmended
2020-06-09SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-08SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2020-03-02HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-02-27HousePassed As Amended
2020-02-27HouseAmended
2020-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-02-17HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/HB/HB1559.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1500-1599/HB1559IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1500-1599/HB1559PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1500-1599/HB1559SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/ham/HB1559_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1559_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/0520007.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1620022.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1760009.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1760011.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback