MS HB1556 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The "comprehensive Career And Technical Education Reform (ccater) Act"; To Amend Section 37-15-38, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Dual Credit Career And Technical Education Instructors Shall Not Be Required To Hold An Associate Or Bachelor's Degree; To Amend Section 37-16-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The State Board Of Education To Provide Notice To All Incoming Middle School And Junior High Students Of The Career Track Programs Offered By Local School Boards; To Require All Students In The Career And Technical Education Track To Take The Act Workkeys Assessment; To Revise The Curriculum In The Career Track Program; To Amend Section 37-3-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Local Business Or Other Professional Personnel Shall Not Be Required To Hold An Associate Or Bachelor's Degree In Order To Be Granted A One-year Expert Citizen-teacher License; To Amend Section 37-16-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Sections; To Amend Section 37-17-6, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Accreditation System Shall Include Student Performance On The Administration Of The Act Workkeys Assessment, Which Shall Be Weighted In The Same Percentage As The Standard Act Assessment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Career and technical education; revise curriculum, instructor license requirements and certain assessments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09SenateDied In Committee
2020-05-12SenateReferred To Education;Economic and Workforce Development
2020-02-27HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-02-25HousePassed
2020-02-25HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-02-25HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-02-17HouseReferred To Workforce Development

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback