MS HB1552 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 951, Local And Private Laws Of 2011, As Amended By Chapter 925, Local And Private Laws Of 2015, To Extend The Repeal Date Until July 1, 2022, On The Law That Authorizes The Board Of Supervisors Of Washington County, Mississippi, To Impose A Tax Of Up To Two Percent On The Gross Proceeds Derived From Hotel And Motel Room Rentals Within The County For Purposes Of Funding A Sports Complex For Youth; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Washington County; extend the repeal date on the tax on hotels and motels.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hines [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2018-02-21 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed |
2018-02-14 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |