MS HB1552 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Columbus-lowndes Convention And Visitors Bureau; To Provide The Composition And Powers Of The Bureau; To Authorize The Bureau To Contribute Funds To The Columbus-lowndes Development Link; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Columbus and Lowndes County; establish Columbus-Lowndes Convention and Visitors Bureau.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chism [R] | Rep. Tyrone Ellis [D] | Rep. Karl Gibbs [D] | Rep. Esther Harrison [D] |
Rep. Jimmy Puckett [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-31 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-31 | Recommitted For Further Conf | |
2011-03-31 | Recommitted For Further Conf | |
2011-03-30 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-30 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-30 | Conferees Named Butler (38th),Bryan,Ward | |
2011-03-29 | Conferees Named Perkins,Chism,Watson | |
2011-03-29 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-28 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-28 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-28 | Amended | |
2011-03-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-03-25 | DR - TSDP: LP To FI | |
2011-03-24 | Referred To Local and Private;Finance | |
2011-03-24 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-24 | Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-03-24 | DR - TSDPCS: WM To LP | |
2011-03-22 | DR - TSDPCS: LP To WM | |
2011-03-08 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation;Ways and Means |