MS HB1548 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Require Schools And School Sponsored Athletic Events, Including School Boards, And Operators Of Independent Charter Schools, To Support, Adopt, And Implement A Cardiac Emergency Response Plan That Integrates Evidence Based Core Elements In Accordance With The American Heart Association's Guidelines Or Another Nationally Recognized, Evidence Based Standard; To Exempt Schools From The Prerequisite That A Mississippi Licensed Physician Must Exercise Medical Control Authority Over The Person Using An Aed; To Require That Any Person Using An Automated External Defibrillator Must Use A Fda Approved Device To Assure The Safety And Reliability Of The Device; To Amend Section 41-60-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Preceding Provisions; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cardiac emergency response plan; require local school district to implement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-14 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-02SenateDied In Committee
2024-03-20SenateReferred To Education
2024-03-18HouseTransmitted To Senate
2024-03-14HousePassed As Amended
2024-03-14HouseAmended
2024-03-14HouseReconsidered
2024-03-08HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (McCarty, Roberson)
2024-03-07HousePassed
2024-02-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2024-02-19HouseReferred To Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
416033Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback