MS HB1547 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Entitled The "mississippi Critical Physician Shortage Incentive Act Of 2012"; To Provide That The Gross Income Of Newly Licensed Physicians Practicing Medicine And Residing In Critical Physician Shortage Areas Shall Not Include Any Income In Excess Of $100,000.00 Derived From Providing Medical Services In Critical Physician Shortage Areas; To Provide That The Exemption From Gross Income Authorized By This Section May Be Utilized By The Qualifying Physician For Ten Consecutive Years If The Physician Practices And Resides In Such An Area For That Period Of Time; To Amend Section 27-7-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; exclude from gross income a portion of income of certain physicians practicing in critical physician shortage areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Died In Committee | |
2012-03-29 | Referred To Finance | |
2012-03-27 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-27 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2012-03-26 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Brown (66th), Smith (39th), Rogers (61st)) | |
2012-03-26 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-03-26 | Amended | |
2012-03-22 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-12 | Referred To Ways and Means |