MS HB1523 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Saltillo, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax That Shall Not Exceed Two Percent Upon The Gross Sales Of Hotels And Motels Derived From Room Rentals And Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants For The Purpose Of Generating Revenue To Enhance Tourism And Parks And Recreation; To Require An Election Be Held On The Question Of Whether Such Tax May Be Levied; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Saltillo; authorize tourism tax on hotels, motels and restaurants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-22 | Senate | DR - TSDP: LP To FI |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |
2022-02-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-16 | House | Passed |
2022-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |