MS HB1523 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-235, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Limitation On The Additional Poll Managers That The Election Commissioners May Appoint For Each 1,000 Registered Voters In Each Voting Precinct Above The First 500; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Poll managers; remove limitation on additional that election commissioners may appoint.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Elections |
2020-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed |
2020-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |