MS HB1523 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "protecting Freedom Of Conscience From Government Discrimination Act"; To Provide Certain Protections Regarding A Sincerely Held Religious Belief Or Moral Conviction For Persons, Religious Organizations And Private Associations; To Define A Discriminatory Action For Purposes Of This Act; To Provide That A Person May Assert A Violation Of This Act As A Claim Against The Government; To Provide Certain Remedies; To Require A Person Bringing A Claim Under This Act To Do So Not Later Than Two Years After The Discriminatory Action Was Taken; To Provide Certain Definitions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Protecting Freedom of Conscience from Government Discrimination Act; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Philip Gunn [R] | Rep. William Arnold [R] | Rep. Scott Bounds [R] | Rep. Lester Carpenter [R] |
Rep. Andy Gipson [R] | Rep. William Shirley [R] | Rep. Randy Boyd [R] | Rep. Dan Eubanks [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 69 N: 44 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Motion to Reconsider Tabled (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 80 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Motion to Reconsider Tabled (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 80 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-04 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-04-01 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hughes, Gipson, Hood) |
2016-04-01 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Amended |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2016-02-24 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-02-24 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-02-19 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Straughter, Gipson, Hood) |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-02-19 | House | Amended |
2016-02-19 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |