MS HB1521 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Sections 23-15-637 And 23-15-651, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Absentee Ballots Received By Mail Must Be Postmarked By The Date Of The Election And Received By The Registrar No More Than Five Business Days After The Election; To Prescribe The Time For Casing All Absentee Ballots In Person In The Office Of The Registrar To Be Deposited In A Secured And Sealed Box In The Circuit Clerk's Office Upon Receipt; To Provide That The Ballot Box Used Shall Be Sealed At The Close Of Each Business Day And Shall Remain Sealed Until The Beginning Of The Next Business Day; To Provide That All Votes Cast By Absentee Ballot Shall Be Final; To Provide That No Person Who Votes Absentee Before The Election Shall Be Allowed To Vote In Person On Election Day; To Authorize The Secretary Of State To Issue Certain Rules Relating To Absentee Ballots; To Amend Section 23-15-645, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Absentee Ballots Cast In The Registrar's Office Shall Be Processed On Election Day And Announced Simultaneously With All Other Votes Cast On Election Day; To Provide For The Retention And Destruction Of Packages Of Protested, Void And Wholly Blank Ballots, Voted Ballots, Open Packages Of Unused Ballots, Sealed Packages Of Unused Ballots, And All Absentee And Military Ballots And Ballot Envelopes; To Amend Section 23-15-649, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That For All Elections The Election Officials Shall Prepare Absentee Ballots In The Same Form As Official Ballots Or Ballots With A Header Of Different Tint; To Amend Sections 23-15-627 And 23-15-713, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Eligibility For Absentee Voting In Person Or By Mail To Any Person Unable To Appear Personally At The Polling Place Of The Election District In Which He Or She Is A Qualified Voter Because Of A Physician-imposed Quarantine Due To Covid-19 During The Year 2020 Or The Voter Is Caring For A Person Who May Be Exposed To Such Risk; To Amend Sections 23-15-715 And 23-15-719, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That For All Elections The Registrar Shall Mail Together To The Absentee Voter The Application And Proper Absentee Voter Ballot; To Provide Certain Conditions On Counting Absentee Ballots By The Resolution Board; To Amend Sections 23-15-625, 23-15-629, 23-15-631, 23-15-635, 23-15-639, 23-15-641, 23-15-647, 23-15-699, 23-15-721, 23-15-731, 23-15-733 And 23-15-735, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee ballots; revise procedures and timeline for mailing to voter and receiving from voter.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 96 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Approved by Governor
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-01HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-30SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2020-06-29SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2020-06-29SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-26SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-26HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-22SenateConferees Named Branning,Tate,Blount
2020-06-22HouseConferees Named Beckett,Eubanks,Reynolds
2020-06-19HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-17SenateReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-15SenatePassed As Amended
2020-06-15SenateAmended
2020-06-08SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-05-11SenateReferred To Elections
2020-03-11HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-03-10HousePassed
2020-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-17HouseReferred To Apportionment and Elections

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/HB/HB1521.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1500-1599/HB1521IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1500-1599/HB1521PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1500-1599/HB1521SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1521_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1521_S_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1521_S_Amend_02_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1521_S_Amend_03_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1521_S_Amend_04_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1521_S_Amend_05_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/0640030.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1610021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1740015.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1750030.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback