MS HB1521 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-115-43, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes The University Of Mississippi Medical Center To Create A Center Of Excellence To Provide Care For Abused And Neglected Children At The Blair E. Batson Hospital For Children, To Delete The Repealer; To Amend Section 41-111-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Child Death Review Panel; To Amend Section 43-13-119, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Duty Of The Division Of Medicaid To Implement A Dialysis Transportation Program; To Amend Section 73-26-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repealer On The Authority To Grant Temporary Licenses To Physician Assistants; And For Related Purposes.
Title
UMMC Center of Excellence for abused and neglected children; delete repealer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-23 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-22 | Conferees Named Bryan,Frazier,Yancey | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Holland,Dedeaux,Coleman (65th) | |
2010-03-16 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-05 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-04 | Amended | |
2010-02-24 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-08 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-04 | Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |