MS HB1510 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Be Known As The Gestational Age Act; To Enact Definitions; To Prohibit Abortions After 15 Weeks' Gestation; To Provide Civil Penalties; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gestational Age Act; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 75 N: 34 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 79 N: 31 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-03-08HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2018-03-07SenateReturned For Concurrence
2018-03-07SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2018-03-06SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2018-03-06SenatePassed As Amended
2018-03-06SenateAmended
2018-02-27SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2018-02-23SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare
2018-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-02-02HousePassed
2018-01-30HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-01-15HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/history/HB/HB1510.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/1500-1599/HB1510IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/1500-1599/HB1510PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/1500-1599/HB1510SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/sam/HB1510_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/sam/HB1510_S_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/sam/HB1510_S_Amend_02_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/sam/HB1510_S_Amend_03_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/sam/HB1510_S_Amend_04_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/votes/house/0320008.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/votes/senate/0640039.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/votes/house/0660014.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback