MS HB151 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 97-5-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Mandatory Reporting Of Sex Crimes Against Minors And To Provide For Mandatory Filing Of Charges By Law Enforcement On Behalf Of A Victim Of A Sex Crime Against A Minor When Probable Cause Exists; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Protection Act; revise.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 98 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 99 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23 Approved by Governor
2013-04-08SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2013-04-08HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2013-04-02SenateConference Report Adopted
2013-03-30HouseConference Report Adopted
2013-03-29SenateConference Report Filed
2013-03-29HouseConference Report Filed
2013-03-27SenateConferees Named Hopson,Doty,Butler (38th)
2013-03-25HouseConferees Named Gipson,Monsour,Mims
2013-03-14HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2013-03-13SenateReturned For Concurrence
2013-03-12SenatePassed As Amended
2013-03-12SenateAmended
2013-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2013-02-22SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2013-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2013-01-30HousePassed As Amended
2013-01-30HouseAmended
2013-01-30HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2013-01-24HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2013-01-11HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback