MS HB1509 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Failed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Failed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation From Special Funds In The State Treasury For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi Department Of Transportation, For The Fiscal Year 2018; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriation; Transportation, Department of.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Charles Busby [R] | Rep. William Arnold [R] | Rep. Mark Baker [R] |
Rep. David Baria [D] | Rep. Toby Barker [R] | Rep. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. Scott Bounds [R] |
Rep. Chris Brown [R] | Rep. Alyce Clarke [D] | Rep. Becky Currie [R] | Sen. Scott DeLano [R] |
Rep. William Denny [R] | Rep. Andy Gipson [R] | Rep. Robert Huddleston [D] | Rep. Alex Monsour [R] |
Rep. John Moore [R] | Rep. David Myers [D] | Rep. Gary Staples [R] | Rep. Sara Thomas [D] |
Rep. Jerry Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Died In Conference |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2017-03-27 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2017-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Simmons (13th),Hopson |
2017-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Read,Busby,Arnold |
2017-03-16 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2017-02-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed |
2017-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred To Appropriations |