MS HB1507 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The City Of Brandon, Mississippi, To Levy A 3% Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Room Rentals From Hotels And Motels Within The City For The Purpose Of Funding An Amphitheatre And Other Ancillary Improvements; To Provide For An Election On Whether The Tax May Be Levied; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Brandon; authorize a tax on hotels and motels to fund amphitheater and other ancillary improvements.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-16 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-16 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2016-04-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-04-06 | House | Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |