MS HB1504 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Senatobia, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Hotels And Motels Derived From Room Rentals And Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants; To Provide For An Election On Whether The Tax May Be Levied; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Senatobia; authorize tax levy on hotels, motels and restaurants.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 8 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 8 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2014-03-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-03-03 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed |
2014-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |