MS HB150 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-106-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Loan Forgiveness To Individuals Providing Instructional Or Clinical Service As A Licensed Dyslexia Therapist In A Public Or Eligible Nonpublic School For The Mississippi Dyslexia Forgivable Loan Program; To Amend Section 37-106-57, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Awards Granted Under The William Winter Teacher Forgivable Loan Program Shall Be Available To Nontraditional Licensed Teachers Under Certain Conditions; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Dyslexia Forgivable Loan Program; clarify type of service committee to qualify for.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16 Approved by Governor
2019-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateConference Report Adopted
2019-03-25HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-25SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Tollison,Wiggins,Wilemon
2019-03-19HouseConferees Named Bennett,Byrd,Roberson
2019-03-12HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-11SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-07SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-07SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-03-04SenateDR - TSDP: ED To AP
2019-02-27SenateReferred To Education;Appropriations
2019-02-13HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-12HousePassed
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-05HouseDR - TSDP: AP To ED
2019-02-04HouseDR - TSDP: ED To AP
2019-01-11HouseReferred To Education;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback