MS HB1491 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-5-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Permit Certain Vehicles Operated By An Engine Fueled Primarily By Compressed Or Liquefied Natural Gas To Exceed The Gross Weight And Axle Weight Limitations When Operating On Interstate Highways; To Bring Forward Sections 63-5-27, 63-5-29 And 63-5-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Vehicle weight limits; allow certain excess of limits for vehicles operated by engine fueled with compressed or LNG.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Byrd [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2020-03-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Transportation |