MS HB1490 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-31-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Number Of Legal Assistants In The Seventeenth Circuit Court District And To Provide Legal Assistants For The Twenty-third Circuit Court District; To Amend Section 25-31-10, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Number Of Criminal Investigators For District Attorneys To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Create New Section 9-7-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create The Twenty-third Circuit Court District; To Create New Section 9-7-64, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Judges Of The Twenty-third Circuit District; To Amend Section 9-7-45, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reduce The Number Of Counties In The Seventeenth Circuit Court District; To Amend Section 9-7-46, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reduce The Number Of Judges For The Seventeenth Circuit Court District; To Amend Section 9-5-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add One Chancellor To The Third Chancery Court District At A Later Date; To Provide The Procedure To Fill The Judicial Office And Office Of District Attorney For The Twenty-third Circuit Court District And The New Chancellorship For The Third Chancery District; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Judicial districts; revise certain chancery and circuit.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Doty,McCaughn,Parker |
2020-06-24 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Lamar,White |
2020-06-23 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Lamar,Blackmon |
2020-06-19 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-04 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: JA To AP |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Appropriations |
2020-05-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-12 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-03-03 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To JA |
2020-02-27 | House | DR - TSDPAA: JA To AP |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary A;Appropriations |