MS HB1490 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Due From Governor 04/24/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Due From Governor 04/24/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 73-21-179 And 73-21-183, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prescribe The Procedures For Conducting An Audit Under The Pharmacy Audit Integrity Act; To Remove Certain Exclusions From The Definitions Of "health Insurance Plan" And "pharmacy Benefit Management Plan" For The Purposes Of The Pharmacy Audit Integrity Act; To Codify New Section 73-21-191, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Monetary Penalties To Be Imposed On Pharmacy Benefit Managers For Noncompliance With The Pharmacy Audit Integrity Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pharmacy Audit Integrity Act; revise certain provisions of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-13 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Failed to Suspend Rules (Y: 71 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Failed to Suspend Rules (Y: 71 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Due From Governor 04/24/12 | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-13 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-05 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-05 | Amended | |
2012-04-03 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-20 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare | |
2012-03-19 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2012-03-14 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Baria, Mims, Barker) | |
2012-03-14 | Passed | |
2012-03-14 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Read the Third Time | |
2012-03-13 | Failed to Suspend Rules | |
2012-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |