MS HB1487 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Paying The Expenses And Providing Contingent Funds For The Legislature, The Expenses Of The Joint Legislative Budget Committee, The Expenses Of The Joint Legislative Committee On Performance Evaluation And Expenditure Review, The Expenses Of The Joint Legislative Reapportionment Committee, The Expenses Of The Joint Committee On Compilation, Revision And Publication Of Legislation, Paying The Monthly Expense Allowance Of The Members Of The Legislature, Paying The State's Share Of Various Assessments, And Related Purposes, For The Fiscal Year 2012.
Title
Appropriation; Legislative expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 110 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-31 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 145 | |
2011-03-18 | Conferees Named Davis,Hyde-Smith,Lee (47th) | |
2011-03-16 | Conferees Named Stringer,Flaggs,Hines | |
2011-03-11 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-09 | Amended | |
2011-03-08 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-21 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2011-02-17 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Passed | |
2011-02-15 | Read the Third Time | |
2011-02-15 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-15 | Referred To Appropriations |