MS HB1481 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Juvenile Detention Facilities Licensing Act; To Provide Certain Definitions; To Prescribe Certain Duties Of The Juvenile Facilities Monitoring Unit In Its Role As A Licensing Agency; To Require The Department Of Education To Promulgate Certain Rules As They Pertain To The Education Of Children Housed In Juvenile Detention Facilities; To Provide That Juvenile Detention Facilities Must Have A License To Operate As Of October Of 2017; To Require The Licensing Agency To Make Inspections; To Provide A Hearing And Appeals Process If A Juvenile Detention Facility's License Is Suspended, Revoked Or Restricted; To Amend Section 43-21-321, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove Certain Minimum Standards For The Juvenile Detention Center; To Amend Section 43-21-323, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Provide That The Juvenile Facilities Monitoring Unit Shall Train Juvenile Detention Officers; To Provide That No Statements, Admissions Or Confessions Or Incriminating Information Obtained From A Youth During A Screening Or Assessment Shall Be Admitted Into Evidence Against The Child On The Issue Of Whether The Child Committed A Delinquent Act; To Amend Section 43-21-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add The Terms "assessment" And "screening" Under The Youth Court Law; To Amend Section 43-21-559, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Statements, Admissions Or Confessions From Being Admitted Into Evidence To Determine Delinquency; To Amend Sections 43-21-561 And 43-21-603, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Require That Language And Sign Language Interpretation Services Be Provided For Certain Youth At Juvenile Detention Centers; To Provide Definitions; To Require Juvenile Detention Centers To Adopt A Policy Providing For Interpretation Services For Certain Youth At The Centers; To Provide That Interpreters Shall Be Made Available 24 Hours A Day To Assist The Centers; To Require The Centers To Post Notices Advertising The Interpretation Services Within The Detention Centers; To Require Funding For Such Services; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Juvenile Detention Facilities Licensing Act; create and require interpretation services and certain girls' facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Appropriations |
2016-03-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-23 | House | DR - TSDPCS: YF To ED |
2016-02-18 | House | DR - TSDPCS: ED To YF |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Education;Youth and Family Affairs |