MS HB148 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-1-64, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Portion Of Monies In The Mississippi Development Authority Tourism Advertising Fund Shall Be Used For Advertising And Promotional Information And Materials Related To Mississippi State Parks; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Development Authority Tourism Advertising Fund; use portion of monies in to advertise state parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | DR - TSDP: TO To AP |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Tourism;Appropriations |
2021-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-02-02 | House | DR - TSDPCS: AP To TO |
2021-01-28 | House | DR - TSDPCS: TO To AP |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred To Tourism;Appropriations |