MS HB1479 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 99-19-51, 99-19-53 And 99-19-55, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Authority Of The Commissioner Of The Mississippi Department Of Corrections To Inflict The Death Penalty; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Department of Corrections Commissioner; revise authority to inflict the death penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Bain [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 40 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 92 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 81 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 92 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 81 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,England,DeBar |
2022-03-16 | House | Conferees Named Bain,Sanford,Miles |
2022-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2022-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed |
2022-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
99 | 19 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 19 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 19 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |