MS HB1479 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 916, Local And Private Laws Of 2011, As Amended By Chapter 910, Local And Private Laws Of 2014, As Amended By Chapter 945, Local And Private Laws Of 2017, To Extend The Repeal Date From July 1, 2021, To July 1, 2023, On The Provision Of Law That Authorizes The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Mccomb, Mississippi, To Impose A Tourism Tax Within The City, And To Expend The Proceeds Of The Tax To Promote Tourism, Parks And Recreation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of McComb; extend date of repeal on hotel/motel tourism tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Mims [R] | Rep. Daryl Porter [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-28 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-28 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2021-03-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-03-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |