MS HB1476 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That An Inmate, As Long As The Inmate Is Not Convicted Of Capital Murder Or Sentenced To Death, Shall Be Eligible For Parole If He Or She Has Been Diagnosed With A Terminal Illness Or Disease And Has A Life Expectancy Of A Year Or Less Or Is Completely Disabled And Does Not Have The Ability To Provide Self-care And He Or She Is Bedridden Or The Inmate Has Limited Self-care Capacity And Is Bedridden At Least 50% Of Waking Hours; To Require The Department Of Corrections To Provide To The Parole Board, Every Thirty Days, A List Of Inmates Who May Be Eligible For Parole Eligibility Due To Certain Medical Conditions; To Require The Department Or Its Medical Director To Notify The Parole Board Of Any Inmate Who Is Diagnosed With A Terminal Illness Or Disease Within Seventy-two Hours Of The Diagnosis; To Amend Section 47-7-4, To Authorize The Parole Board, Along With The Commissioner Of Corrections And The Department Of Correction's Medical Director, To Place Certain Offenders On Conditional Medical Release If The Offenders Have Been Diagnosed With A Terminal Illness Or Disease And Have A Life Expectancy Of A Year Or Less Or Is Completely Disabled And Does Not Have The Ability To Provide Self-care And Is Bedridden Or The Offender Has Limited Self-care Capacity And Is Bedridden At Least 50% Of Waking Hours; To Require The Department Of Corrections To Provide To The Parole Board, Every Thirty Days, A List Of Inmates Who May Be Eligible For Conditional Medical Release Due To Certain Medical Conditions; To Require The Department Or Its Medical Director To Notify The Parole Board Of Any Inmate Who Is Diagnosed With A Terminal Illness Or Disease Within Seventy-two Hours Of The Diagnosis; To Amend Section 47-7-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Compassionate Parole Eligibility Act of 2020; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Horan [R] | Rep. Bill Kinkade [R] | Rep. Kabir Karriem [D] | Rep. Daryl Porter [D] |
Rep. John Faulkner [D] | Rep. Bo Brown [D] | Rep. Abe Hudson [D] | Rep. Carl Mickens [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 98 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Barnett,Wiggins,Sparks |
2020-06-22 | House | Conferees Named Horan,Roberson,Yates |
2020-06-18 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Amended |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
2020-03-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-12 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-03 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To CN |
2020-02-27 | House | DR - TSDP: CN To AP |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Corrections;Appropriations |