MS HB1469 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 1005, Local And Private Laws Of 2004, As Amended By Chapter 923, Local And Private Laws Of 2008, As Amended By Chapter 915, Local And Private Laws Of 2011, As Last Amended By Chapter 912, Local And Private Laws Of 2014, To Extend The Repeal Date From July 1, 2017, To July 1, 2021, On The Provision Of Law Authorizing The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Pascagoula, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Derived From Hotel, Motel And Bed-and-breakfast Room Rentals In The City; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Pascagoula; extend the repeal date on the tourism tax levied on hotels/motels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Died In Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/history/HB/HB1469.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/1400-1499/HB1469IN.htm |