MS HB1468 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 909, Local And Private Laws Of 2013, To Clarify The Authority Of The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Pass Christian, Mississippi, That Allows The Operation Of Low-speed Vehicles And Golf Carts Within The City; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Pass Christian; clarify operation of golf carts and low-speed vehicles within city.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2020-06-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed |
2020-06-18 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-06-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |