MS HB1465 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-11)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 97-3-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Expand The Provision Of Law Regarding The Requirements For Enhanced Penalties For Simple Assault And Aggravated Assault By Adding "health Care Providers"; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault and aggravated assault; include health care providers in provisions regarding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Approved by Governor
2019-03-14SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-12SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-11SenatePassed
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-03-05SenateDR - TSDP: JB To CR
2019-02-25SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division B;Corrections
2019-02-14HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-13HousePassed
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback