MS HB1461 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 909, Local And Private Laws Of 1999, As Amended By Chapter 941, Local And Private Laws Of 2004, As Amended By Chapter 958, Local And Private Laws Of 2008, To Extend The Repealer On The Provisions Of Law Which Create The Jackson Convention And Visitors Bureau And Impose A Tax On The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants, Hotels And Motels For The Purpose Of Providing Funds For The Bureau; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Jackson; extend repeal date on Jackson Convention and Visitors Bureau.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-05 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-01 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-31 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-31 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-31 | Amended | |
2011-03-31 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-03-31 | DR - TSDPAA: FI To LP | |
2011-03-25 | DR - TSDP: LP To FI | |
2011-03-24 | Referred To Local and Private;Finance | |
2011-03-24 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-24 | Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-03-24 | DR - TSDPCS: WM To LP | |
2011-03-22 | DR - TSDPCS: LP To WM | |
2011-02-10 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation;Ways and Means |