MS HB1460 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize Medical Directors Of Hospices To Prescribe Controlled Substances For Patients Of The Hospice For Terminal Disease Pain Without Having An In-person Face-to-face Visit With A Patient Before Issuing A Prescription; To Amend Section 41-29-137, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provision; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospice; allow medical directors to prescribe controlled substances for pain for terminally ill patients without in person visit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-07HousePassed
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback