MS HB1450 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Create To The "foreign Fraudulent Judgment Protection Act"; To Provide That A Court May Consider The Issue Of Due Process And Fraud When Enforcing Foreign Judgments; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Foreign judgment; authorize courts to consider due process and fraud issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2020-03-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |